EP2184595 - TREATING APPARATUS, CENTER-HOLE WORKING SYSTEM, CENTER-HOLE POSITION DECIDING PROGRAM, AND CENTER-HOLE POSITION DECIDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komatsu NTC Ltd. 100 Fukuno Nanto-City Toyama 959-1595 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Komatsu NTC Ltd. 100 Fukuno Nanto-City Toyama 959-1595 / JP | ||
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Komatsu Machinery Corp. Jigata 5 Yookaichi-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0868 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMOTO, Akihiro c/o KOMATSU MACHINERY CORP. Tsu 23 Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0392 / JP | [2017/26] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
YOSHIMOTO, Akihiro c/o KOMATSU MACHINERY CORP. Tsu 23 Futsu-machi Komatsu-shi Ishikawa 923-0392 / JP | Representative(s) | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/42] | Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/19] | Kastel, Stefan, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791385.1 | 22.07.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008JP63104 | Priority number, date | JP20070201323 | 01.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007201323 | [2010/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009016988 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184595 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184595 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/30, B23Q17/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
G01M1/24 (EP,US);
G01M1/30 (KR);
B23Q17/00 (KR);
G01B21/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MITTELLOCHBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, PROGRAMM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER MITTELLOCHPOSITION UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER MITTELLOCHPOSITION | [2010/19] | English: | TREATING APPARATUS, CENTER-HOLE WORKING SYSTEM, CENTER-HOLE POSITION DECIDING PROGRAM, AND CENTER-HOLE POSITION DECIDING METHOD | [2010/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT, SYSTÈME D'USINAGE DE TROU CENTRAL, PROGRAMME DE DÉCISION DE LA POSITION DU TROU CENTRAL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCISION DE LA POSITION DU TROU CENTRAL | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2009 | Translation filed | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2008 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | IE | 22.07.2017 | LU | 22.07.2017 | MT | 22.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | GB | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.07.2008 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.07.2008 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.07.2008 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
MT | 22.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
GB | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
LU | 22.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4884210 (BLAIMSCHEIN GOTTFRIED [AT]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, lines 18-49 * * column 4, lines 50-58 *; | [Y]JPH05172682 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0016] * | International search | [YA]JPS5246740B (Honda Engineering Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1, 2, 4-9 * , Column 6, line 4 to column 7, line 9 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [Y]JPH05172682 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 4-9 * , Par. Nos. [0014] to [0015] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09174382 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH109342 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH1062144 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 3 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PX]JP2007264746 (NISSAN MOTOR) [PX] 1, 4-9* , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) * | Examination | - Farzin H Montazersadgh ET AL, "Stress Analysis and Optimization of Crankshafts Subject to Dynamic Loading", (20070815), URL: http://www.recycle-steel.org/~/media/Files/Autosteel/Programs/LongProducts/crankshaft_full_report_2.pdf, (20170123), XP055338004 |