29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
26.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
19.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
19.06.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
19.06.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
12.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
18.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.10.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
21.04.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
09.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
05.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|