EP2173112 - PARTITION, CONTROL METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Tetsujiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
ARIMITSU, Akihiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SHIMA, Junichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
EMA, Takuro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791599.7 | 25.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008JP63350 | Priority number, date | JP20070194508 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007194508 | [2010/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009014198 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2173112 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02, F21S11/00, H04N5/64, H04R1/00, H04R1/32, H04R7/04 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04R1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | PARTITION, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2010/14] | English: | PARTITION, CONTROL METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2010/14] | French: | COMPARTIMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2010 | Translation filed | 18.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 27.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6229165U ; | [Y]JPS6336698 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH08122621 (TOYOSETSUTO KK); | [Y]JPH11113081 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2001016514 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003316286 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2007067538 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2007074675 |