08.09.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
05.09.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.09.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
16.09.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
16.09.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
05.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
02.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
25.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|