EP2333731 - VALUABLE MEDIUM MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VALUABLE MEDIUM MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glory Ltd. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOI, Kazuhiro c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 02 /
NISHIDA, Koichi c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08792421.3 | 12.08.2008 | [2011/24] | WO2008JP64488 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010018625 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333731 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07D9/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G06Q20/381 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG WERTVOLLER MEDIEN | [2011/24] | English: | VALUABLE MEDIUM MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VALUABLE MEDIUM MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2011/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE VALEURS ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE VALEURS | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2011 | Translation filed | 08.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 18.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5687162 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO); | [A]JPH09128460 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO) | by applicant | JP3330801B |