EP2185739 - ZR-TI-NI(CU) BASED BRAZING FILLER ALLOY COMPOSITIONS WITH LOWER MELTING POINT FOR THE BRAZING OF TITANIUM ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korean Institute of Industrial Technology 89, Yangdaegiro-gil Ipjang-myeon Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2013/25] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Korean Institute of Industrial Technology 35-3, Hongcheon-ri Ipjang-myeon Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-Do 330-825 / KR | ||
For all designated states Yosan Eng. Ltd. 101 Jeiville 691-3 I-dong Sangrok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 426-863 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Seung-Yong 405-1106 Songdo New City Poonglim Apt. Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-730 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Dong-Myoung 552-300 Seojeong-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 459-010 / KR | 03 /
SUN, Ju-Hyun 216-905 Woosung Apt. 634 Yeonsu 2-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-763 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yong-Hwan 214-402 Songdo New City Poonglim Apt. Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-735 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Dong-Han 304-110 Daelim 3 Cha Apt. 940 Dongchun 1-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-701 / KR | [2013/22] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
SHIN, Seung-Yong 405-1106 Songdo New City Poonglim Apt. Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-730 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Dong-Myoung 552-300 Seojeong-dong Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 459-010 / KR | |||
03 /
SUN, Ju-Hyun 216-905 Woosung Apt. 634 Yeonsu 2-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-763 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Yong-Hwan 214-402 Songdo New City Poonglim Apt. Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-735 / KR | |||
05 /
KANG, Dong-Han 304-110 Daelim 3 Cha Apt. 940 Dongchun 1-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-701 / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08793120.0 | 07.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008KR04606 | Priority number, date | KR20070079148 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070079148 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009020364 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2185739 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185739 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2185739 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22C16/00, B23K35/32 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C22C16/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/32 (EP,KR,US);
C22C1/02 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C45/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | C22C16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZR-TI-NI(CU)-HARTLOTLEGIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGEREM SCHMELZPUNKT ZUM HARTLÖTEN VON TITANLEGIERUNGEN | [2010/20] | English: | ZR-TI-NI(CU) BASED BRAZING FILLER ALLOY COMPOSITIONS WITH LOWER MELTING POINT FOR THE BRAZING OF TITANIUM ALLOYS | [2010/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ALLIAGE DE BRASURE À BASE DE ZR-TI-NI (CU) PRÉSENTANT UN POINT DE FUSION BAS POUR LE BRASAGE D'ALLIAGES DE TITANE | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | Translation filed | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2008 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | NO | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63273592 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X] - QIANG ET AL, "Formation of e/a-constant phases in the Ti-Zr-Ni-Cu system", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS:PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, (20070319), vol. 449-451, doi:10.1016/J.MSEA.2006.02.440, ISSN 0921-5093, pages 565 - 568, XP005914687 [X] 7-12 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msea.2006.02.440 | [A] - CHANG E ET AL, "LOW-MELTING-POINT TITANIUM-BASE BRAZING ALLOYS-PART 1: CHARACTERISTICS OF TWO-, THREE-, AND FOUR-COMPONENT FILLER METALS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS ENGINEERING AND PERFORMANCE, ASM INTERNATIONAL, MATERIALS PARK, OH, US, (19971201), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1059-9495, pages 792 - 796, XP000726077 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5334344 (HEGNER FRANK [DE], et al); | [A]JPH1140583 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD, et al); | [A]US6149051 (VOLLMER JOHN [US], et al); | [A]WO2006068948 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al); | [A] - ONZAWA TADAO ET AL., "Development Of Titanium-Based Brazing Filler Metals with Low- Melting-Point.", JOURNAL OF HIGH PRESSURE INSTITUTE OF JAPAN., (2002), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 18 - 27 | [A] - E. CHANG ET AL., "Low-Melting-Point Titanium-Base Brazing Alloys-Part 1: Characteristics of Two-, Three-, and Four-Component Filler Metals.", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS ENGINEERING AND PERFORMANCE., (199712), vol. 6, pages 792 - 796, XP000726077 |