EP2188601 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE LEVEL L OF A LIQUID WITHIN A SPECIFIED MEASURING RANGE BY MEANS OF RADAR SIGNALS TRANSMITTED TO THE LIQUID SURFACE AND RADAR SIGNALS REFLECTED FROM THE LIQUID SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enraf B.V. Delftechpark 39 2628 XJ Delft / NL | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRIER, Ronald, Cornelis Dertienhuizen 20 NL-2611 NC Delt / NL | 02 /
SAI, Bin Menno Ter Braakstraat 20 NL-2548 EA Den Haag / NL | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08793817.1 | 01.09.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008NL00196 | Priority number, date | NL20071034327 | 04.09.2007 Original published format: NL 1034327 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009031884 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188601 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN DES PEGELS L EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINER SPEZIFIZIERTEN MESSENTFERNUNG MITTELS ZU DER FLÜSSIGKEITSOBERFLÄCHE GESENDETEN RADARSIGNALEN UND VON DER FLÜSSIGKEITSOBERFLÄCHE REFLEKTIERTEN RADARSIGNALEN | [2010/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE LEVEL L OF A LIQUID WITHIN A SPECIFIED MEASURING RANGE BY MEANS OF RADAR SIGNALS TRANSMITTED TO THE LIQUID SURFACE AND RADAR SIGNALS REFLECTED FROM THE LIQUID SURFACE | [2010/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DU NIVEAU L D'UN LIQUIDE DANS UNE PLAGE DE MESURE DÉFINIE AU MOYEN DE SIGNAUX RADAR TRANSMIS À LA SURFACE DU LIQUIDE ET DE SIGNAUX RADAR RÉFLÉCHIS PAR LA SURFACE DU LIQUIDE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 06.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 03.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005052314 (SPANKE DIETMAR [DE], et al) [A] * figure 3; claim 15 *; | [A]DE102004061449 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0887658 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE], et al); | [A]GB2342995 (FEDERAL IND IND GROUP INC [CA]); | [A]EP0573034 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF 2006 CIE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RADAR 16-19 OCT. 2006 SHANGHAI, CHINA, Proceedings of 2006 CIE International Conference on Radar (IEEE Cat. No.06TH8857) IEEE Piscataway, NJ, USA, (20061016), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-9582-4, pages 463 - 466 vol.1, XP002477789 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICR.2006.343173 | [ ] - SAI B ET AL, "Advanced high precision radar gauge for industrial applications", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (2006), Database accession no. 9429069 | Examination | WO2008006391 | NL1031209C |