EP2166934 - LASER SPECKLE IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Callaghan Innovation Gracefield Research Centre 69 Gracefield Road Lower Hutt 5010 / NZ | [2015/28] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH LIMITED Gracefield Research Centre 69 Gracefield Road 5010 Lower Hutt / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Oliver Bendix 60a Oxford Terrace Epuni Lower Hutt 5011 / NZ | 02 /
ANDREWS, Michael Kenneth 417 B Grays Road Pauatahanui Wellington 5381 / NZ | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Clarke, Alison Clare Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08793923.7 | 07.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008NZ00161 | Priority number, date | NZ20070556379 | 06.07.2007 Original published format: NZ 55637907 | US20080035193 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: US 35193 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009008745 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2166934 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/444 (EP,US);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
G01N21/47 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0233 (EP,US);
A61B5/7207 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABBILDUNG VON LASER-SPECKLES | [2010/13] | English: | LASER SPECKLE IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2010/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE À GRANULITÉ LASER AMÉLIORÉS ET PROCÉDÉS | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7113817 (WINCHESTER JR LEONARD W [US] ET AL) [X] 2,3,5,7-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 55 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 1 * * column 8, line 6 - line 30 * * column 11, line 16 - line 31 * * figure 7 * [Y] 1,4,6; | [XP] - ASHWIN B. PARTHASARATHY ET AL, "Robust flow measurement with multi-exposure speckle imaging", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20080101), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OE.16.001975, ISSN 1094-4087, page 1975, XP055037318 [XP] 2,3,5,7-15 * page 1977, paragraph 1 - page 1982, paragraph 2 * * page 1983, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 1984, paragraph l - page 1985, paragraph 1 * * page 1989, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.001975 | [YD] - BONNER R ET AL, "Model for laser Doppler measurements of blood flow in tissue", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19810615), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1364/AO.20.002097, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2097 - 2107, XP002391513 [YD] 1,4,6 * page 2098, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.20.002097 | [XP] - THOMPSON O B ET AL, "Spectral density and tissue perfusion from speckle contrast measurements", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING USA, (20080121), vol. 6847, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 68472D - 1, XP009162473 [XP] 1,4,6,8-13 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.761453 | International search | [X]US7113817 (WINCHESTER JR LEONARD W [US], et al) [X] 28 to 36, 42, 43 and 67. * See Column 3 line 22 to column 5 line 44, column 9 line 20 to column 19 line 2 and figure 8. *; | [A]US4950070 (AIZU YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 0 * . See whole document. *; | [A]US6076010 (BOAS DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 0 * See whole document. *; | [A]US6944494 (FORRESTER KEVIN R [CA], et al) [A] 0 * See whole document. * | by applicant | US7113817 | - APPLIED OPTICS, (1981), vol. 20, pages 2097 - 2107 | - BRIERS, J.D., "Laser Doppler, speckle and related techniques for blood perfusion mapping and imaging", PHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT, (2001), vol. 22, pages R35 - R66 | - BONNER; NOSSAL, "Model for laser Doppler measurements of blood flow in tissue", APPLIED OPTICS, (1981), vol. 20, pages 2097 - 2107 | - JENTINK ET AL., "Monte Carlo simulations of laser Doppler blood flow measurements in tissue", APPLIED OPTICS, (1990), vol. 29, pages 2371 - 2381 | - M. D., NATURE, (1975), vol. 254, pages 56 - 58 | - FORRESTER ET AL., "A Laser Speckle Imaging Technique for Measuring rissue Perfusion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 51, pages 2074 - 2084 | - SEEMANTINI K. ET AL., "Characterization of Atherosclerotic Plaques by Laser Speckle Imaging", CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 112, pages 885 - 892 |