EP2232912 - NETWORK CONTROLLED THROUGHPUT FOR ENHANCED UPLINK FACH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERSTENBERGER, Dirk Birger Jarlsgatan 113 C S-113 56 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
BERGMAN, Johan Kungsholmgatan 9 S-112 27 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
ISRAELSSON, Martin Mjölnarstigen 15 S-163 41 Spånga / SE | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08794142.3 | 12.08.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008SE50917 | Priority number, date | US20080026633 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 26633 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009099368 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232912 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232912 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/16 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP);
H04B7/2612 (KR);
H04B7/2603 (KR);
H04L1/0001 (KR);
H04L5/0053 (KR);
H04W28/22 (EP,KR);
H04W88/12 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | NETZWERKGESTEUERTER DURCHSATZ FÜR ERWEITERTEN AUFWÄRTSSTRECKEN-FACH | [2010/39] | English: | NETWORK CONTROLLED THROUGHPUT FOR ENHANCED UPLINK FACH | [2010/39] | French: | DÉBIT COMMANDÉ PAR RÉSEAU POUR CANAL FACH DE LIAISON MONTANTE AMÉLIORÉ | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HR | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | IE | 12.08.2011 | LU | 12.08.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | NO | 18.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.08.2011 | ||
LU | 12.08.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.08.2011 | ||
LU | 12.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005117551 (HAN JEONG-HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [ABSTRACT]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0017] *; | [X]US2005207359 (HWANG WOONHEE [FI], et al) [X] 1-46 * paragraphs [ABSTRACT] , [0038] , [0111] - [0117] *; | [X]EP1868403 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-46 * paragraphs [ABSTRACT] , [0020] , [0038] *; | [X] - SHARMA G ET AL, "Moving towards HSUPA (high speed uplink packet access): a complete 3.5 G wireless system", PERSONAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, 2005. ICPWC 2005. 2005 IEEE INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON NEW DELHI, INDIA JAN. 23-25, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050123), ISBN 978-0-7803-8964-9, pages 174 - 177, XP010798540 [X] 1,15 * pages 174-175 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPWC.2005.1431326 | [A] - INTERDIGITAL, "Intercell interference with Enhanced Uplink for Cell_FACH", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2#60 BIS, Sevilla, Spain, vol. Tdoc, no. R2-080411, (20080114), pages 1 - 3, URL: ww.3gpp.org, (20081210), XP002508161 [A] 1-46 * pages 1-3 * | [XP] - INTERDIGITAL, "Max Transport Block Size limit for EUL in CELL_FACH UEs", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 #59 BIS, Shenzen, China, no. R3-080884, (20080331), pages 1 - 1, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20081210), XP002508162 [XP] 1-46 * page 1 * |