EP2185451 - ARRANGEMENT FOR CONVEYING OF SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/20] | ARRANGEMENT FOR STACKING SHEETS | ||
[2015/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnau AB Långgatan 21 341 32 Ljungby / SE | [2015/45] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Lasermax Roll Systems AB Långgatan 21 341 32 Ljungby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENJAMINSSON, Peter Replösavägen 18 S-SE-341 37 Ljungby / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Jan-Erik Möcklagård 2 S-SE-341 93 Bolmsö / SE | [2010/30] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
BENJAMINSSON, Peter Fogdegatan 20 S-SE-341 37 Ljungby / SE | ||
02 /
PERSSON, Jan-Erik Möcklagård 2 S-SE-341 93 Bolmsö / SE | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2010/48] | VALEA AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Nikolopoulou, Sofia, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Nikolopoulou, Sofia, et al Albihns.Zacco AB Patent Department P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08794148.0 | 14.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008SE50923 | Priority number, date | SE20070001892 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: SE 0701892 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009025612 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185451 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185451 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/70, B65H29/66, B65H29/68, B65H31/36, B65H31/06, B65H31/30 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
B65H29/6627 (EP,US);
B65H29/66 (SE);
B65H29/14 (EP,US);
B65H29/68 (SE);
B65H29/70 (EP,SE,US);
B65H31/10 (EP,US);
B65H31/3054 (EP,US);
B65H31/36 (EP,US);
B65H2301/51214 (EP,US);
B65H2404/6942 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | B65H29/70, B65H29/66, B65H29/68, B65H31/36, B65H31/06 | ||
Former IPC [2010/20] | B65H29/70, B65H29/66, B65H29/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON BÖGEN | [2015/39] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR CONVEYING OF SHEETS | [2015/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSPORTER DES FEUILLES | [2015/39] |
Former [2010/20] | ANORDNUNG AUS GESTAPELTEN FLÄCHENGEBILDEN | ||
Former [2010/20] | ARRANGEMENT FOR STACKING SHEETS | ||
Former [2010/20] | AGENCEMENT POUR EMPILER DES FEUILLES | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 14.08.2016 | LU | 14.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 14.08.2008 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.08.2008 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.08.2008 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 14.08.2016 | ||
LU | 14.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB783976 (MASSON SCOTT & COMPANY LTD, et al) | International search | [A]US2261972 (LANDAFF MATTHEWS LOUIS); | [A]GB985227 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG); | [A]US4346881 (FRYE KENNETH G); | [A]EP0192211 (LITTLETON IND CONSULTANTS INC [US]) | Examination | US2006056953 | by applicant | GB783976 | GB985227 | EP0192211 |