EP2205338 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING TOXIC METALS FROM A FLUID STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADKAREE, Kishor P 120 Weston Lane Painted Post, new York 14870 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Benedict Y 148 Scenic Drive Horseheads, New York 14845 / US | 03 /
KUANG, Peiqiong Q 120 Kennedy Drive Horseheads, New York 14870 / US | 04 /
LIU, Anbo 3416 Conhocton Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Oldroyd, Richard Duncan Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2010/28] | Application number, filing date | 08795631.4 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008US10155 | Priority number, date | US20070966657P | 29.08.2007 Original published format: US 966657 P | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009032129 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2205338 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/86 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/8665 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/304 (EP,US);
B01D2255/104 (EP,US);
B01D2255/202 (EP,US);
B01D2255/204 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2257/602 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON TOXISCHEN METALLEN AUS EINEM FLUIDSTROM | [2010/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING TOXIC METALS FROM A FLUID STREAM | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RETIRER LES MÉTAUX TOXIQUES D'UN FLUX DE LIQUIDE | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4500327 (NISHINO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * example 7; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US2006045829 (DODWELL GLENN W [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0030]; example 1 *; | [X]US6136749 (GADKAREE KISHOR P [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, lines 7-15 * * column 2, lines 28-40 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 13 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 35 * * column 8, lines 11-43; claim - *; | [A]US2007179056 (BAEK JEOM I [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0001]; figure 2 * |