EP2188650 - NON-CONTACT CAPACITIVE DATALINK FOR A DOWNHOLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For all designated states Prad Research and Development Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town 1110 Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42 rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola 1110 / VG | |||
For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For all designated states Prad Research and Development Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town 1110 Tortola / VG | |||
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Smith International, Inc. 1310 Rankin Road Houston, TX 77073 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIURA, Jujnichi One Hermann Museum Circle 3083 Texas, TX 77004 / US | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
SUGIURA, Junichi 4400 Memorial Drive 3107 Houston, TX 77007 / US | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08795675.1 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008US10201 | Priority number, date | US20070897597 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 897597 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009032163 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188650 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, E21B17/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G01V11/002 (EP,US);
E21B17/028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | G01V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | KONTAKTLOSE KAPAZITIVE DATENVERBINDUNG FÜR EINE BOHRLOCHBAUGRUPPE | [2010/21] | English: | NON-CONTACT CAPACITIVE DATALINK FOR A DOWNHOLE ASSEMBLY | [2010/21] | French: | LIAISON DE DONNÉES CAPACITIVE SANS CONTACT POUR UN ENSEMBLE DE FOND | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2254430 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [A] 1* page 12 - page 13 *; | [A]EP0525459 (SCHWAN ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, column 6, line 37 - line 58; claims 1,7,8,9 *; | [Y]US5625352 (KLEMM PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6,21-23 * column 5, line 10 - line 16; claims 1,3 *; | [YA]WO2005059298 (GEOLINK UK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6,21-23 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,3a,3b * * page 5, paragraphs 1,5 * [A] 7-20; | [A]US2006013065 (VARSAMIS GEORGIOS L [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0043] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059] * | International search | [Y]US3780593 (COLEMAN R, et al) [Y] 12-13 and 17 * , especially col. 1, line 13-15 and col. 6, line 19-20. *; | [Y]US5955809 (SHAH MAHESH J [US]) [Y] 31-38* , especially col. 4, line 14 and 29-30. *; | [Y]US6756719 (CHIU CHUN-CHEN [TW]) [Y] 31-38 * , especially Fig. 3, col. 1, line 19-20, col. 2, line 56-58, col. 4, line 1 and 9-10 and col. 9, line 56-57. *; | [XY]US2005285706 (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-5 and 21-30 * , entire document especially Fig. 13, para [0005], [0044]-[0045], [0047]-[0049], [0055] and [0066]. * [Y] 6-20 and 31-38; | [Y]US7025130 (BAILEY THOMAS F [US], et al) [Y] 6-20 * , especially col. 2, line 25-26 and 55-57, col. 4, line 67 and col. 5, line 1. * |