EP2158515 - REFLECTION-REPRESSED WIRE-GRID POLARIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moxtek, Inc. 452 West 1260 North Orem, UT 84057 / US | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Bin 1269 South 1125 West Orem, UT 84058 / US | 02 /
GARDNER, Eric, W. 2456 E Valley Drive Eagle Mountain, UT 84005 / US | 03 /
PERKINS, Raymond, T. 686 South 850 East Orem, UT 84097 / US | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters Port of Liverpool Building Pier Head Liverpool L3 1AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2010/09] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08795929.2 | 19.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008US67427 | Priority number, date | US20070767336 | 22.06.2007 Original published format: US 767336 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009002792 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158515 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02B5/30, G02B5/02 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G02B5/3058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | DRAHTGITTERPOLARISATOR MIT REFLEKTIONSUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2010/09] | English: | REFLECTION-REPRESSED WIRE-GRID POLARIZER | [2010/09] | French: | POLARISEUR À GRILLE DE FILS À RÉFLEXION RÉPRIMÉE | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6122103 (PERKINS RAYMOND T [US], et al); | [A]US6654168 (BORRELLI NICHOLAS F [US], et al); | [A]US2005088739 (CHIU CHIH-HO [TW], et al) | [A] - WANG, J.J. ET AL., "High-Performance Nanowire-Grid Polarizers", OPTICS LETTERS., (200501), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 195 - 197, XP008122710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.30.000195 |