EP2171477 - PORTABLE DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Detection Inc. 2202 Lakeside Boulevard Edgewood, MD 21040 / US | For all designated states Smiths Detection-Watford Limited 64 Clarendon Road Watford Herts WD17 1DA / GB | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWINGTON, Jay 7 Donnafields Bisley, Surrey GU24 9DP / GB | 02 /
CZAJKA, John, Walter 16 Bramble Lane West Grove, PA 19390 / US | 03 /
GREEN, Douglas, Jason 14101 Manor Road Baldwin, MD 21013 / US | 04 /
VOLPE, Carmelo 5 The Poplars Chestnut Waltham Cross Hertforshire EN7 6AR / GB | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796079.5 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US69022 | Priority number, date | US20070929577P | 03.07.2007 Original published format: US 929577 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009006523 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2171477 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N21/64 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01L2200/14 (EP,US);
B01L2200/147 (EP,US);
B01L2200/185 (EP,US);
B01L2300/023 (EP,US);
B01L2300/024 (EP,US);
G01N35/00871 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES DETEKTIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2010/14] | English: | PORTABLE DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2010/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION PORTABLES | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006013573 (MENDY ERAD LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-41 * pages 1,7,9-12, column , * * pages 16,22 * * pages 40,41 * * pages 71,73 * * claim - * * page 35, lines 28-30 * * page 36, lines 12-21 * * page 44, lines 19-31 *; | [X]US2005069454 (BELL MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-6,11-29 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0012] , [0025] , [0027] , [0041] * * claim - *; | [X]WO0052444 (CYRANO SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-29 * pages 1-4,7,8 * * pages 23,31 * * claim - *; | [X]WO02061417 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-6,11-29 * pages 1,2,4, * * pages 6,7 * * claim - *; | [A]US2004082332 (MCCANN THOMAS MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,11,14,17,20,27,31 * page 3 - page 4 * * claim - * |