|
10.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
102 |