29.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
05.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
06.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
08.08.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
31.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.03.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
05.03.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
06.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|