EP2171791 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL MIXED METAL OLIVINES FOR LITHIUM ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A123 Systems LLC 200 West Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states A123 Systems, Inc. Arsenal On The Charles 321 Arsenal Street Watertown MA 02472 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIANG, Yet-ming 52 Lake Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
CHU, Andrew, C. 2 Arlington Street Unit 14 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 03 /
JANG, Young-ii 180 Evelin Road Needham, MA 02494 / US | 04 /
MEETHONG, Nonglak 305 Memorial Drive Apt. 618A Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
KAO, Yu-hua 305 Memorial Drive Apt. 618a Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
RILEY, Gilbert, N. 630 Hemenway Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 07 /
PULLEN, Anthony, E. 95 Hull Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 08 /
THOMAS-ALYEA, Karen, E. 157 Newport Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
CHIANG, Yet-ming 52 Lake Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | ||
02 /
CHU, Andrew, C. 2 Arlington Street Unit 14 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | |||
03 /
JANG, Young-ii 27 Turner Terrace Newtonville, MA 02460 / US | |||
04 /
MEETHONG, Nonglak 305 Memorial Drive Apt. 618A Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
KAO, Yu-hua 305 Memorial Drive Apt. 618a Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
06 /
RILEY, Gilbert, N. 630 Hemenway Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
07 /
PULLEN, Anthony, E. 95 Hull Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
08 /
THOMAS-ALYEA, Karen, E. 157 Newport Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Benson, Christopher Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796171.0 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US69858 | Priority number, date | US20070949410P | 12.07.2007 Original published format: US 949410 P | US20080026665 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 26665 | US20080037122 | 17.03.2008 Original published format: US 37122 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009009758 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2171791 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M4/58, H01M10/40, H01M4/36 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/3835 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLE MISCHMETALL-OLIVINE FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIEN | [2010/14] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL MIXED METAL OLIVINES FOR LITHIUM ION BATTERIES | [2010/14] | French: | OLIVINES À MÉTAL MIXTE MULTIFONCTIONNEL POUR BATTERIES À ION LITHIUM | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 03.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1150368 (SONY CORP [JP])[A] 1-15; | [A]US2004197654 (BARKER JEREMY [GB], et al) [A] 1-15; | [X]WO2007030816 (A123 SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-15 * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0167]; claims 3, 5 * | International search | [A]US5691083 (BOLSTER MARY ELIZABETH [US]); | [A]KR20040033278 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2005014637 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2007128723 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | US2004005265 | US2005233219 | WO2007030816 |