EP2318138 - HANDHELD POWDER HANDLING DEVICES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biodot, Inc. 17781 Sky Park Circle Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMMO, Anthony, V. 22221 Shadow Ridge Mission Viejo CA 92692 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Read, David Graham WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Read, David Graham W. P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796211.4 | 16.07.2008 | [2011/19] | WO2008US70230 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010008387 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318138 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/0265 (EP);
B01L2200/0657 (EP);
B01L2200/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN DER HAND GEHALTENE PULVERHANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERWANDTE VERFAHREN | [2011/19] | English: | HANDHELD POWDER HANDLING DEVICES AND RELATED METHODS | [2011/19] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE MANIPULATION DE POUDRE PORTATIFS ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 21.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5672155 (RILEY ROBERT Q [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2327628 (PEERLESS SYSTEMS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005262951 (COTE RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006027033 (COTE RICHARD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9208964 (NOVONORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |