EP2176653 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DETERMINATION OF ANALYTE CONCENTRATION USING TIME RESOLVED AMPEROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states NIPRO DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderale, FL 33309 / US | ||
For all designated states Kayihan, Ferhan 5533 Beverly Avenue Ne Tacoma, WA 98422-1402 / US | |||
For all designated states Deng, David Z. 959 Nandina Drive Weston, FL 33327 / US | |||
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Home Diagnostics, Inc. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | ||
For all designated states Kayihan, Ferhan 5533 Beverly Avenue Ne Tacoma, WA 98422-1402 / US | |||
For all designated states Deng, David Z. 959 Nandina Drive Weston, FL 33327 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYIHAN, Ferhan 5533 Beverly Avenue Ne Tacoma, WA 98422-1402 / US | 02 /
DENG, David, Z. 959 Nandina Drive Weston, FL 33327 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08796603.2 | 25.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US71132 | Priority number, date | US20070952076P | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 952076 P | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009015319 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176653 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176653 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
G01N27/3273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ANALYTKONZENTRATION MITTELS ZEITAUFGELÖSTER AMPEROMETRIE | [2010/16] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DETERMINATION OF ANALYTE CONCENTRATION USING TIME RESOLVED AMPEROMETRY | [2010/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER LA CONCENTRATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE À ANALYSER EN UTILISANT UNE AMPÉROMÉTRIE RÉSOLUE DANS LE TEMPS | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 12.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2008 | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6251260 (HELLER ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-36* figure 3 *; | [A]EP1256798 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092]; figure 11 *; | [X]US2003096420 (HELLER ZINDEL HERBERT [US]) [X] 1-36 * paragraphs [0052] - [0066]; figures 1-3,9 *; | [A]US2004045821 (CUI GANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0076] - [0080]; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP1522592 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] , [0076]; figures 10A-10C * | by applicant | US2003096420 |