EP2183896 - FREQUENCY DIVERSE TRANSMISSIONS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
BANISTER, Brian Clarke 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
02 /
BANISTER, Brian Clarke 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
03 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2010/19] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08797821.9 | 13.08.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008US73063 | Priority number, date | US20070955543P | 13.08.2007 Original published format: US 955543 P | US20080190432 | 12.08.2008 Original published format: US 190432 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009023736 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2183896 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2183896 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/0023 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,BR,US);
H04B1/7136 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG MIT FREQUENZDIVERSITY IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/15] | English: | FREQUENCY DIVERSE TRANSMISSIONS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2010/19] | French: | TRANSMISSIONS DIVERSES DE FRÉQUENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/19] | ÜBERTRAGUNGEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN FREQUENZEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NO | 17.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9939473 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 15 * * page 30, line 8 - page 31, line 11 * * figure 20 * * claims 1,10 *; | [A]WO2005043948 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34* paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP1662825 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0014] , [0059] - [0069] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2006280116 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2007024936 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0045] , [0057] , [0067] , [0072] - [0074] - [0077] * * figure 2 *; | [XA] - MOTOROLA ET AL, "EUTRA Downlink Distributed Multiplexing and Mapping Rules TP", INTERNET CITATION, (20060508), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_45/Docs/R1-061173.zip, (20080110), XP007903801 [X] 1-28,30,31,33,34 * the whole document * [A] 29,32 | [XA] - ERICSSON, "E-UTRA DL - Localized and distributed transmission", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_January-06/Docs/, (20070709), XP002441567 [X] 1-28,30,31,33,34 * the whole document * [A] 29,32 | [PXA] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Pseudo-random hopping pattern for PDSCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073265, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070814), vol. tsg_ran\WG1_RL1\TSGR1_50\Docs, no. Athens, Greece; 20070820, XP050106900 [PX] 1-28,30,31,33,34 * the whole document * [PA] 29,32 | [XA] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Principles of Unicast Scheduling for Downlink and Uplink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-070439, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070109), vol. tsg_ran\WG1_RL1\TSGR1_47bis\Docs, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20070115, XP050104470 [X] 29,32 * the whole document * [A] 1-28,30,31,33,34 | [PXA] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "PUSCH and PUCCH hopping patterns", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073264, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070814), vol. tsg_ran\WG1_RL1\TSGR1_50\Docs, no. Athens, Greece; 20070820, XP050106899 [PX] 29,32 * chapter "2.5 Multiplexing of hopped and non-hopped transmissions" * [PA] 1-28,30,31,33,34 |