EP2195898 - PRESSURE RESTRAINING ENCLOSURE FOR CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVONIUK, Christopher J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, William L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BANDYOPADHYAY, Pradip K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08797958.9 | 15.08.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US73275 | Priority number, date | US20070852522 | 10.09.2007 Original published format: US 852522 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009035814 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195898 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/18, H02G15/24 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H02G15/24 (EP,US);
H02G15/1833 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/24] | H02G15/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | DRUCKEINGRENZUNGSGEHÄUSE FÜR KABEL | [2010/24] | English: | PRESSURE RESTRAINING ENCLOSURE FOR CABLES | [2010/24] | French: | GAINE ANTI-PRESSION DESTINÉE À DES CÂBLES | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2181904 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]GB2218280 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US5374784 (WENTZEL CARL J [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US5408047 (WENTZEL CARL J [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0780949 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6103975 (KRABS RAYMOND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [AD]US2007027236 (BANDYOPADHYAY PRADIP K [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3886669 (PELSUE THURMAN A); | [A]KR0121579Y (PYUNG IL IND CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO9962156 (UTILX CORP [US], et al); | [A]KR100777062B (PYUNGIL CO LTD [KR], et al) |