|
22.11.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |