EP2201051 - POLYVINYLAMIDE POLYMERS CONTAINING POLYMERIZABLE FUNCTIONALITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP Investments LLC 1011 Centre Road Suite 315 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Isp Investments Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 303 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOD, David, K. 29 Concord Lane Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
MUSA, Osama, M. 24 Meadowbrook Drive Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Harrison, Susan Joan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08797996.9 | 15.08.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008US73344 | Priority number, date | US20070955947P | 15.08.2007 Original published format: US 955947 P | US20080073535 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: US 73535 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009023843 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201051 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28, C08F220/58, C08F226/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C08F220/60 (EP,US);
C08F218/08 (EP,US);
C08F226/06 (EP,US);
C08F226/10 (EP,US);
C09D133/066 (US);
C09D139/04 (US);
C08F220/26 (EP,US);
C08F220/325 (EP,US);
C08F220/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | POLYVINYLAMIDPOLYMERE MIT POLYMERISIERBAREN FUNKTIONALITÄTEN | [2010/26] | English: | POLYVINYLAMIDE POLYMERS CONTAINING POLYMERIZABLE FUNCTIONALITIES | [2010/26] | French: | POLYMÈRES DE POLYVINYLAMIDE CONTENANT DES FONCTIONNALITÉS POLYMÉRISABLES | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0368217 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-38 * example 19 *; | [X]EP0687719 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1-38 * examples E,F,G *; | [A]EP0368218 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0248395 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-38 * the whole document * | Examination | FR2239486 | by applicant | EP0103184 | US2007056900 | US7300022 | - B.S.R. REDDY, JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 43, pages 251 - 258 | - S.A. SUKHISHVILI, JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 44, pages 183 - 191 |