EP2181342 - ADAPTIVE ULTRASOUND IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION BASED ON SENSING OF LOCAL MEDIA MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verasonics, Inc. 22222 NE 62nd Place Redmond, WA 98053 / US | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAIGLE, Ronald, Elvin 22126 Northeast 62nd Place Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08798512.3 | 22.08.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008US74055 | Priority number, date | US20070957600P | 23.08.2007 Original published format: US 957600 P | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009026534 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181342 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181342 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
G01S7/5205 (EP,US);
G01S15/89 (KR);
A61B8/5276 (EP,US);
G01S15/8997 (EP,US);
G01S7/52 (KR);
G01S7/52046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF DER MESSUNG LOKALER MEDIENBEWEGUNG BASIERENDE ADAPTIVE ULTRASCHALLBILDREKONSTRUKTION | [2010/18] | English: | ADAPTIVE ULTRASOUND IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION BASED ON SENSING OF LOCAL MEDIA MOTION | [2010/18] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGE ULTRASONORE ADAPTATIVE À PARTIR DE LA DÉTECTION D'UN MOUVEMENT DE MILIEU LOCAL | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 10.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2016 | 23.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2008 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | IE | 22.08.2017 | LU | 22.08.2017 | MT | 22.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.08.2008 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.08.2008 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5873830 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 5, line 53 * * column 8, line 47 - column 12, line 30 * * column 17, line 10 - column 21, line 48 * [Y] 5-8; | [XY]WO2005023098 (CHIAO RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 16-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0051] * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2005113696 (MILLER STEVEN C [US]) [X] 16-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0027] * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2007078342 (JAGO JAMES [US]) [X] 16-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0029] * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2006113445 (VERASONICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 5, lines 9-13 * * page 12, line 25 - page 17, line 13 * * page 21, line 19 - page 24, line 27 *; | [Y]US2003092989 (AICHHORN MANFRED [AT], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0062] * | by applicant | US5873830 | WO2005023098 | WO2006113445 | US20030722003 | US20040578631 | US20010047977 | US20080911633 |