|
19.01.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |