06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
19.01.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
10.02.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.01.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.09.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.10.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
21.09.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2010 |
First examination report |
|
20.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
02.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
16.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|