Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8824743 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2009054770 | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19688208 | 22.08.2008 | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5689315B | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | B2 | JP2010536502 | 02.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | WO2008US74055 | 22.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2697343 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2017 | C | CA2697343 | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | WO2008US74055 | 22.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2181342 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2017 | B1 | EP2181342 | 05.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | WO2008US74055 | 22.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2181342T | 08.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | WO2008US74055 | 22.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009026534 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101581227B | Global Dossier | 30.12.2015 | B1 | KR20100051108 | 14.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5906273B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | B2 | JP2014158935 | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US95760007 | 23.08.2007 |