EP2185679 - ENCAPSULATED ACTIVE INGREDIENTS FOR CLEANING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSBY, Molly, I-chin 2399 East Mockingbird Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
COPPENS, Karen, A. 5810 Windy Gyle Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
HALL, Mark, J. 4835 Claremont St. no. 2 Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
BUSBY, Molly, I-chin 2399 East Mockingbird Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | ||
02 /
COPPENS, Karen, A. 5810 Windy Gyle Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Mark, J. 1203 Tanwood Court Midland, MI 48642-3150 / US | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08798675.8 | 26.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008US74284 | Priority number, date | US20070968506P | 28.08.2007 Original published format: US 968506 P | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009032615 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185679 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/08, C11D3/22 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTE WIRKSTOFFE FÜR REINIGUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2010/20] | English: | ENCAPSULATED ACTIVE INGREDIENTS FOR CLEANING APPLICATIONS | [2010/20] | French: | INGRÉDIENTS ACTIFS ENCAPSULÉS POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE NETTOYAGE | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 10.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4965012 (OLSON KEITH E [US]) [X] 1-9,1,7,1,7 * claims 3-5,9,11,16,17 * * column 6, line 46 - line 63 *; | [X]WO0016643 (HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 12 * * page 7 * * page 8, lines 12,17 *; | [X]US2004106534 (NITSCH CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-9* paragraphs [0117] , [0121] , [0127] * |