EP2198055 - HUMANIZED PAI-1 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisthera, Incorporated 6202 105th Avenue NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUNTON, Donald, E. 6202 105th Avenue NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
VASQUEZ, Maximiliano 3813 Louis Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Sahans, Sarah Anne, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Sahans, Sarah Anne, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08799269.9 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008US75489 | Priority number, date | US20070970871P | 07.09.2007 Original published format: US 970871 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009033095 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2198055 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07K17/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/36 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C07K16/36 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | C12Q1/68, C07K17/00, C07K14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | HUMANISIERTE PAI-1-ANTIKÖRPER | [2010/25] | English: | HUMANIZED PAI-1 ANTIBODIES | [2010/25] | French: | ANTICORPS PAI-1 HUMANISÉS | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 03.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9501452 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003217371 (VAUGHAN DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2001034327 (BRUNNER NIELS [DK], et al); | [A]WO2006113909 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007048315 (PRESTA LEONARD G [US]) |