EP2195037 - RADIOFLUORINATION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states GE Healthcare UK Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTHBERTSON, Alan GE Healthcare AS P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | 02 /
SOLBAKKEN, Magne GE Healthcare AS P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | 03 /
OLBERG, Dag Erlend Bard Skolmestervei 8 OSLO N-0590 / NO | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
CUTHBERTSON, Alan GE Healthcare AS P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
SOLBAKKEN, Magne GE Healthcare AS P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
OLBERG, Dag Erlend GE Healthcare AS Instituttveien 18 Postboks 65 N-2007 Kjeller / NO | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally, et al GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St.Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Canning, Lewis R. GE Healthcare Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08799352.3 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US75684 | Priority number, date | US20070971007P | 10.09.2007 Original published format: US 971007 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009035959 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195037 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/08, C07K1/13 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C07B59/008 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
C07K1/13 (EP,US);
C07K14/745 (EP,US);
C07K5/0817 (EP,US);
C07K7/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | RADIOFLUORINATIONSVERFAHREN | [2010/24] | English: | RADIOFLUORINATION METHODS | [2010/24] | French: | METHODES DE RADIOFLUORATION | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2008083191 (GE HEALTHCARE AS [NO], et al) [PX] 1-15,20-28 * claims 1-28 *; | [Y]WO2006030291 (AMERSHAM HEALTH AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-15,20-28 * claims 1-13 *; | [PX] - OLBERG D E ET AL, "A novel prosthetic group for site-selective labeling of peptides for positron emission tomography", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY 200806 US, (200806), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 1301 - 1308, XP002522665 [PX] 1-15,20-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc800007h | [Y] - CARRASCO MICHAEL R ET AL, "Chemoselective alkylation of N-alkylaminooxy-containing peptides.", ORGANIC LETTERS 3 AUG 2006, (20060803), vol. 8, no. 16, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 3529 - 3532, XP002522500 [Y] 1-15,20-28 * paragraph [0001] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol061289d | [Y] - BARK S J ET AL, "A HIGHLY EFFICIENT METHOD FOR SITE-SPECIFIC MODIFICATION OF UNPROTECTED PEPTIDES AFTER CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (20000419), vol. 122, no. 15, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3567 - 3573, XP002946035 [Y] 1-15,20-28 * paragraph [0001] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja000217t |