Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8444955 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2010196270 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67642708 | 09.09.2008 | US97100707 | 10.09.2007 | WO2008US75684 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5318874B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010539091 | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US97100707 | 10.09.2007 | WO2008US75684 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2195037 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97100707 | 10.09.2007 | WO2008US75684 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101854957B | 22.05.2013 | B | CN101854957 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US97100707 | 10.09.2007 | WO2008US75684 | 09.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009035959 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | A3 | WO2009035959 | 19.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97100707 | 10.09.2007 |