EP2195116 - VARIABLE FLUID FLOW IN AIR-OPERATED TWO COMPONENT GUN APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graco Minnesota Inc. 88 11th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55413-1894 / US | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIX, Joseph 3301 Century Drive Hastings Minnesota 55033 / US | 02 /
PELLIN, Christopher J. 13034 14th Avenue Burnsville Minnesota 55337 / US | 03 /
WEINBERGER, Mark T. 8011 Eastwood Road Mounds View Minnesota 55112 / US | 04 /
RYDER, Douglas S. 1885 Lachman Avenue NE St. Michael Minnesota 55376 / US | 05 /
VELGERSDYK, Jeffrey N. 9824 Ford Circle Minneapolis, Minnesota 55426 / US | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2010/24] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 08799440.6 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US75959 | Priority number, date | US20070971300P | 11.09.2007 Original published format: US 971300 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009036126 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195116 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195116 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/04 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B05B9/01 (EP,KR,US);
B05B1/3026 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | VARIABLER FLÜSSIGKEITSSTROM IN EINEM LUFTBETRIEBENEN ZWEIKOMPONENTENPISTOLENAPPLIKATOR | [2010/24] | English: | VARIABLE FLUID FLOW IN AIR-OPERATED TWO COMPONENT GUN APPLICATOR | [2010/24] | French: | APPLICATEUR PISTOLET À DEUX COMPOSANTS À COMMANDE PNEUMATIQUE ET À DÉBIT DE FLUIDE VARIABLE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 02.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2008 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 11.09.2012 | IT | 11.09.2012 | LU | 11.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
IT | 11.09.2012 | ||
LU | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
IT | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
IT | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
IT | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3122326 (COOK DUDLEY P) [A] 1 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0700730 (LOCTITE IRELAND LTD [IE]) [A] 1* column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 16; figure - * | International search | [Y]US3814328 (WARNING W); | [Y]US4427153 (SCHAEFER THOMAS J [US]) |