EP2198010 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING THE FUNCTIONAL EFFICACY OF STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ronald UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Davis, California 95618 / US | 02 /
SIU, Chung-wah UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Davis, California 95618 / US | 03 /
LIEU, Deborah K. UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Davis, California 95618 / US | 04 /
LIU, Jing UC Davis Innovation Access 1850 Research Park Drive Davis, California 95618 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08799485.1 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008US76084 | Priority number, date | US20070971855P | 12.09.2007 Original published format: US 971855 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009036220 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2198010 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/08 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C12N5/0657 (EP,US);
A61K35/545 (US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N9/14 (US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
C12N2500/25 (EP,US);
C12N2500/33 (EP,US);
C12N2500/44 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2502/13 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FUNKTIONELLEN WIRKSAMKEIT VON STAMMZELLEN ABGELEITETER HERZMUSKELZELLEN | [2010/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING THE FUNCTIONAL EFFICACY OF STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES | [2010/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER L'EFFICACITÉ FONCTIONNELLE DE CARDIOMYOCYTES DÉRIVÉS D'UNE CELLULE SOUCHE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/20] | 27.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/20] | Appeal following examination | 31.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T1358/16 | 27.05.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 | 30.09.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2013 | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2015 | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005058633 (EPSTEIN NEAL D [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0123] - [0128] - [0153] *; | [Y] - MOORE J C ET AL, "Human embryonic stem cells: Genetic manipulation on the way to cardiac cell therapies", REPRODUCTIVE TOXICOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.REPROTOX.2005.04.012, vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0890-6238, (20050901), pages 377 - 391, (20050901), XP025333567 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 381, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 384, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.reprotox.2005.04.012 | [Y] - DOLNIKOV KATYA ET AL, "Functional properties of human embryonic stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes: intracellular Ca2+ handling and the role of sarcoplasmic reticulum in the contraction.", STEM CELLS (DAYTON, OHIO) FEB 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16322641, (200602), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 236 - 245, XP002596200 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 240, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 241, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/STEMCELLS.2005-0036 | [Y] - MILLER S L W ET AL, "Effects of calsequestrin over-expression on excitation-contraction coupling in isolated rabbit cardiomyocytes", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CARDIORES.2005.04.023, (20050901), vol. 67, no. 4, ISSN 0008-6363, pages 667 - 677, XP004993277 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 675, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cardiores.2005.04.023 | [YP] - LIU JING ET AL, "Functional sarcoplasmic reticulum for calcium handling of human embryonic stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes: insights for driven maturation.", STEM CELLS (DAYTON, OHIO) DEC 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17872499, (200712), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 1549-4918, pages 3038 - 3044, XP002596201 [YP] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3043, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/STEMCELLS.2007-0549 | [Y] - SARTIANI LAURA ET AL, "Developmental changes in cardiomyocytes differentiated from human embryonic stem cells: A molecular and electrophysiological approach", STEM CELLS, ALPHAMED PRESS, DAYTON, OH, US LNKD- DOI:10.1634/STEMCELLS.2006-0466, (20070125), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1136 - 1144, XP002512700 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1137, column 1, paragraphs 2-5; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0466 | International search | [Y]US2005042254 (FREYMAN TOBY [US], et al); | [Y]US2007161107 (MUMMERY CHRISTINE L [NL], et al); | [X] - FU ET AL., "Crucial role of the sarcoplasmic reticulum in the developmental regulation of Ca++ transients and contraction in cardiomyocytes derived from embryonic stem cells.", FASEB JOURNAL, (200601), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 181 - 183, XP008132355 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.05-4501fje | [Y] - BAHARVAND ET AL., "The effect of extracellular matrix on embryonic stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, (200503), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 495 - 503, XP004762359 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2004.12.011 | [Y] - UBER ET AL., "Identification and selection of cardiomyocytes during human embryonic stem cell differentiation.", FASEB JOURNAL, (200708), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 2551 - 2563, XP008132356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.05-5711com | [Y] - PARTON ET AL., "Caveolin-3 associates with developing T-tubules during muscle differentiation.", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (19960113), vol. 136, no. 1, pages 137 - 154, XP008132357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.136.1.137 | [Y] - YANG ET AL., "The ryanodine receptor modulates the spontaneous beating rate of cardiomyocytes during development.", PNAS, (20020709), vol. 99, no. 14, pages 9225 - 9230, XP008132358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.142651999 | [Y] - KOBAN ET AL., "Expressional analysis of the cardiac Na-Ca exchanger in rat development and senescence.", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, (199802), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 405 - 423, XP008132360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6363(97)00276-9 | [Y] - XUE ET AL., "Functional integration of electrically active cardiac derivatives from genetically engineered human embryonic stem cells with quiescent recipient ventricular cardiomyocytes.", CIRCULATION, (20050104), vol. 111, no. 1, pages 11 - 20, XP002550029 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000151313.18547.A2 |