EP2120651 - MAILBOX DELIVERABLE AS A KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarl Creastuce 60 Grande Rue 01430 Saint Martin du Fresne / FR | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRY, Hervé Au Clou F-01430 Maillat / FR | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08799885.2 | 17.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008FR00345 | Priority number, date | FR20070002015 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0702015 | [2009/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008129175 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120651 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120651 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47G29/12 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A47G29/1201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | ALS SATZ LIEFERBARE MAILBOX | [2009/48] | English: | MAILBOX DELIVERABLE AS A KIT | [2009/48] | French: | BOÎTE AUX LETTRES, LIVRABLE EN KIT | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HR | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | NO | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | LU | 17.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2075190 (SCHURMANN HEINTZ ET CO) [A] 1 * page 3, line 21; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2515020 (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 27; figures 9,11 *; | [AD]FR2870097 (SIRANDRE SA SA [FR]) |