EP2195019 - METHOD OF ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST PANDEMIC INFLUENZA VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Limited 45 Poplar Road Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARSE, Martin 27 Hawke Street Parkdale Victoria 3195 / AU | 02 /
ROCKMAN, Steve 43 Elphin Street Ivanhoe Victoria 3179 / AU | 03 /
RYAN, David 8 Murtons Way Port Melbourne Victoria 3207 / AU | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08800134.2 | 09.10.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008AU01500 | Priority number, date | US20070979572P | 12.10.2007 Original published format: US 979572 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009046497 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195019 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/145, A61K39/39, A61P31/16 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US);
A61K2039/58 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER IMMUNANTWORT GEGEN DAS PANDEMISCHE INFLUENZA-VIRUS | [2010/24] | English: | METHOD OF ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST PANDEMIC INFLUENZA VIRUS | [2010/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLICITATION D'UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE DIRIGÉE CONTRE LE VIRUS DE L'INFLUENZA PANDÉMIQUE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 10.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/14] | 28.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2017 | 27.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006100110 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * claims 1,26,27, 44 * * page 13, paragraph 6 * * page 15, paragraph 5 * [Y] 5,12; | [Y] - MATTHEW R. SANDBULTE ET AL, "Cross-Reactive Neuraminidase Antibodies Afford Partial Protection against H5N1 in Mice and Are Present in Unexposed Humans", PLOS MEDICINE, (20070101), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pmed.0040059, ISSN 1549-1277, page E59, XP055015444 [Y] 5,12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pmed.0040059 | International search | [XP]WO2008025095 (CSL LTD [AU], et al); | [X] - ENNIS F.A. ET AL., "Augmentation of human influenza A virus-specific cytotoxic T lymphocyte memory by influenza vaccine and adjuvanted carriers (ISCOMS).", VIROLOGY., (19990705), vol. 259, no. 2, pages 256 - 61, XP004439869 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1999.9765 | [X] - COULTER A. ET AL., "Intranasal vaccination with ISCOMATRIX adjuvanted influenza vaccine.", VACCINE., (20030214), vol. 21, no. 9-10, pages 946 - 9, XP004402622 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00545-5 | [X] - WINDON R.G. ET AL., "Local immune responses to influenza antigen are synergistically enhanced by the adjuvant ISCOMATRIX.", VACCINE., (20011112), vol. 20, no. 3-4, pages 490 - 7, XP027321863 | [X] - SCHEERLINCK JP ET AL., "Local immune responses following nasal delivery of an adjuvanted influenza vaccine.", VACCINE., (20060501), vol. 24, no. 18, pages 3929 - 36, XP025151488 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2006.02.032 | [Y] - SAMBHARA S. ET AL., "Heterosubtypic immunity against human influenza A viruses, including recently emerged avian H5 and H9 viruses, induced by FLU-ISCOM vaccine in mice requires both cytotoxic T- lymphocyte and macrophage function.", CELL IMMUNOL., (20010801), vol. 211, no. 2, pages 143 - 53, XP008101515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/CIMM.2001.1835 | Examination | - PEARSE M J ET AL, "ISCOMATRIX DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2003.12.031 | - SURYAPRAKASH SAMBHARA ET AL, "Heterotypic Protection against Influenza by Immunostimulating Complexes Is Associated with the Induction of Cross-Reactive Cytotoxic T Lymphocytes", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES. JID, CHICAGO, IL., (19980501), vol. 177, no. 5, doi:10.1086/515285, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1266 - 1274, XP055303598 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/515285 |