EP2200776 - Method for operating a gear hobber comprising a motor drive for applying a retaining force to a drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/26] | GEAR HOBBER COMPRISING A MOTOR DRIVE FOR APPLYING A RETAINING FORCE TO A DRUM | ||
[2010/38] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELSOMAT GmbH & Co. KG Gutenbergstrasse 13 75203 Königsbach-Stein / DE | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAEGER, Helmut Haydnstrasse 4 75203 Königsbach-Stein / DE | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08801314.9 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008DE01510 | Priority number, date | DE20071043778 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007043778 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009033467 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2200776 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200776 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23F5/20, B23Q16/06, B23Q16/00, B23Q5/56 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
B23F5/20 (EP);
B23Q16/021 (EP);
B23Q16/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Wälzfräsmaschine mit motorischem Antrieb zur Aufbringung von Haltekraft auf eine Trommel | [2010/38] | English: | Method for operating a gear hobber comprising a motor drive for applying a retaining force to a drum | [2010/38] | French: | Procédé de l'opération d'une machine à fraiser en développante à système d'entraînement à moteur, pour l'application d'une force de maintien sur un tambour | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/26] | WÄLZFRÄSMASCHINE MIT MOTORISCHEM ANTRIEB ZUR AUFBRINGUNG VON HALTEKRAFT AUF EINE TROMMEL | ||
Former [2010/26] | GEAR HOBBER COMPRISING A MOTOR DRIVE FOR APPLYING A RETAINING FORCE TO A DRUM | ||
Former [2010/26] | MACHINE À FRAISER EN DÉVELOPPANTE À SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À MOTEUR, POUR L'APPLICATION D'UNE FORCE DE MAINTIEN SUR UN TAMBOUR | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 29.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2012
16.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Gleason-Pfauter Maschinenfabrik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 14 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Werner, Patrick, et al, et al Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2012
16.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Gleason-Pfauter Maschinenfabrik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 14 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Werner, Patrick, et al, et al Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | 10.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/12] | 22.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.10.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HR | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | IE | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | NO | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | LU | 09.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | GB | 09.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | AT | 09.09.2013 | [2018/17] |
Former [2015/12] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
HU | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
AT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
HU | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB377225 (MIJ EXPLOITATIE OCTROOIEN NV, et al) [A] 4,10 * page 3, line 86 - line 93; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1133571 (ALAN PHILIP LAWLESS THOMAS) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3701504 (INGBUERO GREGR [CH]) [A] 1-13 * figure - *; | [A]DE19857592 (REISHAUER AG [CH]) [A] 1-13* figure - *; | [Y]US2002017161 (WOOLFREY ANDREW M [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column A * * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *; | [DY]DE102006019325 (FELSOMAT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DY] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006019325 |