EP2215537 - ADJUSTABLE PRESSURE REDUCTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller Gas Equipment A/s Mommarksvej 7-11 Vollerup 6400 Sønderborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Müller Gas Equipment A/s Mommarksvej 7-11 Vollerup 6400 Sønderborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORP, Hauke Eichenweg 32 24976 Handewitt / DE | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
TORP, Hauke Europastrasse 50 24941 Jarplund-Weding / DE | Representative(s) | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 08801381.8 | 08.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008DK00347 | Priority number, date | DK20070001452 | 08.10.2007 Original published format: DK 200701452 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009046714 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215537 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215537 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G05D16/0658 (EP);
G05D16/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | JUSTIERBARES DRUCKREDUZIERVENTIL | [2010/32] | English: | ADJUSTABLE PRESSURE REDUCTION VALVE | [2010/32] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RÉDUCTION DE PRESSION AJUSTABLE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2010 | Translation filed | 07.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 08.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 08.10.2011 | LU | 08.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4418524 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 ** column 1, line 40 - line 67 *; | [A]WO02093284 (VEKTEK INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 10 *; | [AD]US2006260690 (WINNIKE DONALD J [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * figure 1b * * page 1, paragraph 14 - page 2, paragraph 17 * |