EP2192975 - REACTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELLEN, Ralph Hardenbergstrasse 9 41539 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
HIZALER HOFFMANN, Evin Em Parkveedel 23c 50733 Köln / DE | 03 /
MLECZKO, Leslaw Quittenweg 1 41542 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
SCHUBERT, Stephan 2202 Canterbury Drive League City, TX 77573 / US | [2010/23] | Application number, filing date | 08801889.0 | 06.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP07297 | Priority number, date | DE20071045123 | 20.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045123 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009039946 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192975 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, B01J8/04, B01J19/00, B01J19/24, B23K1/00, F28D9/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
B01J19/0013 (EP,US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,US);
B01J8/0453 (EP,US);
B01J8/0496 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00194 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00212 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | REAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2010/23] | English: | REACTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2010/23] | French: | RÉACTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 19.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9837457 (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,13 * page 10, lines 2-4 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 17 * * page 23, lines 23-28 * * claims 1,11,16-19 *; | [X]EP0529329 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [X] 1,6-8,13 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE19825102 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-13 * column 3, lines 9-25; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3613596 (SCHNEIDER CHRISTIAN DIPL ING [DE]) [A] * column 3, lines 64-69 * * column 4, lines 34-36 * |