EP2200824 - ENGRAVING HEAD FOR ENGRAVING PRINTING FORMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HELL Gravure Systems GmbH & Co. KG Philipp-Reis-Weg 5 24148 Kiel / DE | [2013/51] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states HELL Gravure Systems GmbH & Co. KG Philipp-Reis-Weg 5 24148 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANGMEYER, Dieter Lindenhof 8 24211 Preetz / DE | 02 /
WOLTER, Jörg Knorrstrasse 9 24106 Kiel / DE | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Götz, et al Breitenburgerstrasse 31 25524 Itzehoe / DE | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 08802227.2 | 16.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP07693 | Priority number, date | DE20071045098 | 20.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045098 | DE20071048668 | 10.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048668 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040013 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2200824 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200824 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/045 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
B41C1/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | GRAVIERKOPF ZUR GRAVUR VON DRUCKFORMEN | [2010/26] | English: | ENGRAVING HEAD FOR ENGRAVING PRINTING FORMES | [2010/26] | French: | TÊTE DE GRAVURE POUR LA GRAVURE DE FORMES D'IMPRESSION | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 17.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2008 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | AT | 16.09.2014 | GB | 16.09.2014 | IE | 16.09.2014 | LU | 16.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.09.2008 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
AT | 16.09.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
AT | 16.09.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
AT | 16.09.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
AT | 16.09.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
AT | 16.09.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
IE | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 16.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0595324 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, lines 24-31 * * figure 3 *; | [X]JPH11198334 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] * * figure 12 *; | [A]US5818605 (CREWE ALBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *; | [DA]DE19952996 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE2508734 | DE2336089 | US1785883 | DE19952996 | EP0595324 | JPH11198334 |