EP2195382 - TRANSPARENT COMPOSITIONS BASED ON HIGH-IMPACT VINYL AROMATIC COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [2012/21] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Polimeri Europa S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONGO, Aldo Via Enrico Paglia 5 I-46100 Mantova / IT | 02 /
CASALINI, Alessandro Viale Hermada 10 I-46100 Mantova / IT | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/22] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/24] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08802660.4 | 22.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008EP08209 | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01854 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071854 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040127 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195382 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195382 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L51/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08F287/00 (EP);
C08L51/006 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/006, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/006, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON SCHLAGZÄHEN VINYLAROMATISCHEN COPOLYMEREN | [2010/24] | English: | TRANSPARENT COMPOSITIONS BASED ON HIGH-IMPACT VINYL AROMATIC COPOLYMERS | [2010/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS TRANSPARENTES À BASE DE COPOLYMÈRES AROMATIQUES VINYLIQUES À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE AU CHOC | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 01.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | LU | 22.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/51] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0832933 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * examples 8,18; table III * * claims 1-8 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 8 *; | [X]DE2448596 (DAICEL LTD) [X] 1-10 * page 6, lines 24-29 * * page 8, lines 25-35 * * page 9, lines 15-18,31,32,37 - page 10, lines 5-14 * * claims 1,4-12 *; | [A]EP0409657 (NOVA PETROCHEMICALS INC [CA]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0356249 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1417242 | EP0832933 | DE2448596 | EP0409657 | EP0356249 | EP0606931 |