|
10.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.02.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |