Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101501797B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B1 | KR20100068270 | 22.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5584623B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2014 | B2 | JP2010540703 | 24.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2195382 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2012 | B1 | EP2195382 | 16.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101809087B | 22.04.2015 | B | CN101809087 | 18.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394596T | 04.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1141545 | 12.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2195382T | 28.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08802660 | 22.09.2008 | WO2008EP08209 | 22.09.2008 | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009040127 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20071854 | 27.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2195382E | 12.12.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071854 | 26.09.2007 |