EP2201672 - METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-3 Communications Magnet-Motor GmbH Petersbrunner Strasse 2 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states L-3 Communications Magnet-Motor Gmbh Petersbrunner Strasse 2 82319 Starnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖHN, Harry Bahnhofstrasse 27 82386 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
LAY, Lars Am Bareisl 24 82327 Tutzing / DE | 03 /
BIEBACH, Jens Bergwiesenstrasse 7 82327 Tutzing / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
HÖHN, Harry Bahnhofstrasse 27 82386 Oberhausen / DE | ||
02 /
LAY, Lars am Bareisl 24 82327 Tutzing / DE | |||
03 /
BIEBACH, Jens Bergwiesenstrasse 7 82327 Tutzing / DE | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch KSNH Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08802674.5 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP08229 | Priority number, date | DE20071046289 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007046289 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009043556 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201672 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201672 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/24, H02P6/24, H02P21/00, B60L7/10, B60L15/02, B60L15/20, H02P25/02, B60L11/18, H02P3/02 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H02P6/24 (EP,US);
B60L15/025 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
H02P21/36 (EP,US);
H02P25/03 (EP,US);
H02P3/025 (EP,US);
H02P3/24 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | H02P6/24, B60L15/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN SYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2010/26] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2010/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR COMMANDER UNE MACHINE SYNCHRONE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 02.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2008 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | AT | 26.09.2013 | IE | 26.09.2013 | LU | 26.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
AT | 26.09.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
AT | 26.09.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 23.01.2013 | |
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | HR | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06253404 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPH089680 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0880086 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XY]US6124645 (JONES CHRISTOPHER CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * column 3, line 19 - line 28; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 1 - line 6 * * column 4, line 28 - line 49 * * column 6, line 21 - line 23 * * column 5, line 5 - line 11; figure 5 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 19; figure 4 * * column 5, line 14 - line 27; figure 3 * * column 5, line 12 - line 13 * * column 1, line 9 - line 11 * [Y] 2-10; | [A]US2004178754 (ANWAR MOHAMMAD NAZMUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1555748 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-10 * column 7, line 8 - line 12 * * column 5, line 8 - line 12 * * column 7, line 22 - line 26 * * figures 2a,2b,4a,4b,5a-5d *; | [Y] - Synchron-Vollpolmaschine ohne Dämpferwicklung. Steuerbedingungen ED - Schröder; Dirk, ELEKTRISCHE ANTRIEBE 2. REGELUNG VON ANTRIEBEN, SPRINGER, PAGE(S) 530 - 571, (19950101), ISBN 978-3-540-57610-5, XP009118119 [Y] 6-8 * page 540; figure 16.23 * | by applicant | US6124645 | US2004178754 | EP1555748 | - "Synchron-Vollpolmaschine ohne Dämpferwicklung, Steuerbedingungen", SCHRÖDER, D., Elektrische Antriebe 2, Regelung von Antrieben, SPRINGER, (19950101), pages 530 - 571 |