04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
01.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
24.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
17.02.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
25.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
11.03.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
08.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.06.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
23.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
16.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|