Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9364009 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | B2 | US2010272874 | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 | WO2008EP08375 | 02.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2187750 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2011 | B1 | EP2187750 | 26.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 | WO2008EP08375 | 02.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE505086T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 | WO2008EP08375 | 02.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008013139 | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 | DE102008013139 | 07.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502008003192D1 | 26.05.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 | WO2008EP08375 | 02.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009046937 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007047114 | 02.10.2007 |