13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
01.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
25.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
19.02.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
11.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
05.06.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] |
01.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
12.03.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.03.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.11.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.12.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.08.2013 |
First examination report |
|
28.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
30.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |
05.11.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
07.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
16.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
12.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|