EP2181273 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BODY BELONGING TO A FRICTION PAIRING, AND BODY BELONGING TO A FRICTION PAIRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Fuchs KG Derschlager Strasse 26 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜNSTER, Jürgen Winzenberg 1a 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | 02 /
GUMMERT, Hermann Stauferstrasse 15 41749 Viersen / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstrasse 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Haverkamp, Jens Stefanstrasse 2 58638 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 08803302.2 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008EP61276 | Priority number, date | DE20071041218 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007041218 | DE20072012150U | 31.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007012150 U | [2010/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027453 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181273 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181273 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/02 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
F16D23/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES ZU EINER REIBPAARUNG GEHÖRENDEN KÖRPERS SOWIE ZU EINER REIBPAARUNG GEHÖRENDER KÖRPER | [2010/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BODY BELONGING TO A FRICTION PAIRING, AND BODY BELONGING TO A FRICTION PAIRING | [2010/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS FAISANT PARTIE D'UN COUPLE DE FRICTION, ET CORPS FAISANT PARTIE D'UN COUPLE DE FRICTION | [2011/33] |
Former [2010/18] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS FAISANT PARTIE D'UN COUPLE DE FRICTION, ET CORPS FAISANT PARTIE D'UN COUPLE DE FRICTION | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | LU | 28.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LU | 28.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LU | 28.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | MT | 24.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2006352 (BORG WARNER) [A] 1,10* page 1, line 121 - page 2, line 87; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP0331264 (SINTERSTAHL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * claims 1-5,12 *; | [XY]DE4027885 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 1, line 1 - line 55 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 1,2; claim 4 * [Y] 4,11-14; | [A]EP1429044 (FUCHS KG OTTO [DE]) [A] 2,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016]; figure 5 *; | [XY]EP1524444 (FED MOGUL OPERATIONS FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 4,11-14; | [A]DE102005048985 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 8,9,15,16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0021] * |