EP2361056 - BLOOD FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2012/04] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 N. Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | ||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Binkert, Christoph Andreas In der Längi 1 8405 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binkert, Christoph Andreas In der Längi 1 8405 Winterthur / CH | [2012/02] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Powell, Stephen David Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08803788.2 | 05.09.2008 | WO2008EP61819 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010025775 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361056 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2361056 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/0103 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2230/006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0089 (EP,US);
A61F2250/003 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0031 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLUTFILTER | [2011/35] | English: | BLOOD FILTER | [2011/35] | French: | FILTRE SANGUIN | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 12.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | LU | 05.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0605276 (CELSA L G SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,8,13 * column 2, lines 12-42,51-58 * * column 5, lines 7-14 * * column 8, lines 2-5 * * figures 1-10 *; | [XY]WO0222048 (TAYSIDE FLOW TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13 * page 10, lines 4-9; figures 16,17 * * page 2, line 12 * * page 4, lines 23-29 * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]US6582447 (PATEL NILESH [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,10-12 * column 5, lines 24-53; figures 2,5-8 *; | [YD]US2003176888 (O'CONNELL PAUL T [US]) [YD] 1-6* paragraph [0105]; figures 1-44 *; | [X]WO2006107939 (BRAUN MEDICAL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] - [0023] *; | [XY]WO2008010197 (NOVATE MEDICAL LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,13 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 17 * * page 24, line 13 - page 30, line 26 * * page 37, lines 13-19 * * figures 1-26(o); claims 51-55 * [Y] 7,10-12 | by applicant | EP0605276 | WO0222048 | US6582447 | US2003176888 | WO2006107939 | WO2008010197 |