Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010191419 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | WO2008EP61850 | 08.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2200856 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2012 | B1 | EP2200856 | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | WO2008EP61850 | 08.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE547711T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | WO2008EP61850 | 08.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101801704B | 06.03.2013 | B | CN101801704 | 11.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | WO2008EP61850 | 08.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009034052 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100057685 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007043207 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043207 | 11.09.2007 |