EP2203328 - VEHICLE SEAT WITH A TABLE STRUCTURE WHICH CAN BE ASSEMBLED FOR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, SE | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUB, Ralf Viktoriastr. 112 47799 Krefeld / DE | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/23] |
Former [2010/27] | Wolff, Harry Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08803920.1 | 10.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008EP61953 | Priority number, date | DE20071045838 | 25.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045838 | [2010/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040247 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203328 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203328 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/46, B60N3/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B60N3/001 (EP);
B60N2/79 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ MIT EINER FÜR DEN BENUTZUNGSFALL AUFBAUBAREN TISCHSTRUKTUR | [2010/27] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT WITH A TABLE STRUCTURE WHICH CAN BE ASSEMBLED FOR USE | [2010/27] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE STRUCTURE DE TABLE POUVANT ÊTRE ASSEMBLÉE EN CAS D'UTILISATION | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 08.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 28.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 04.02.2013 | Appeal received No. T0954/13 | 03.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.05.2014 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2014/21] | 27.06.2014 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/26] | 10.09.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2008 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | IE | 10.09.2015 | LU | 10.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
IE | 10.09.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
IE | 10.09.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1160125 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 38; figure - * [A] 4,7-9; | [X]DE10044414 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2841510 (CERA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |